31/10/1954 |
York Area |
October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
15/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. |
SLS/196111 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
10/10/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. |
SLS/196411 |