|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/02/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. | SLS/196604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5044 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4589 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
19/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45044 | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
29/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
19/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
31/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
09/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2E) | ||
17/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
26/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45044 | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |