|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1967 | Crewe South MPD (Withdrawn) | 45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5052 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4597 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) | ||
08/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
15/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45052 | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
02/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
16/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
06/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (2J) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) | ||
12/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) | ||
11/03/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
15/04/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
12/08/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45052 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |