Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 558 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19469 Week
» 84423 Month
» 287087 Year
» 3313940 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5066 |
m/e |
01/1935 |
British Railways |
45066 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4611 |
To Service |
During 01/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 06/02/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/10/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 44799, 45066, 5476, 17591. |
SLS/194911 |
11/09/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. |
SLS/196310 |
10/10/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. |
SLS/196311 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5066 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4611 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45066 |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
06/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45066 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|