Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2276 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15682 Week
» 68698 Month
» 188225 Year
» 3215078 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5071 |
m/e |
05/1935 |
British Railways |
45071 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
122 |
Works Number |
237 |
To Service |
During 05/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1967 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/06/1952 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80039 left the Works on 18th inst. and engines under repair included the two main line diesels, diesel shunters, and standard Wainwright classes C and H as well as the usual Brighton types. No. 32401 came out freshly painted and lined on 20th, still with the 2-dome boiler. New Class 2 2-6-2T Nos. 41313-41316 and 41318 have been noted, the first three being located here. Unusual visitors today are 'B1' 61138 from Cambridge and Class '5MT' 45071 on through excursions. No. 2573 0-6-2T, whose number had almost disappeared from the bunker sides, has had the figures repainted (at the shed, presumbably) but has not been renumbered. No. 2560 is undergoing thorough overhaul in the Works and will come out as 32560. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5071 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 237 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45071 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45071 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|