Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1458 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19261 Week
» 72277 Month
» 191804 Year
» 3218657 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5074 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
British Railways |
45074 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
122 |
Works Number |
240 |
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/09/1965 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5074 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 240 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45074 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45074 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|