05/04/1954 |
Leeds-Northallerton |
As from 5/4/54 a Farnley Junction (25G) engine has taken over the working of the 3.50 p.m. Leeds City to Northallerton (via Wetherby) and the 8.42 p.m. Northallerton to Leeds City (via Arthington). The engine provided is normally a Stanier Class 5 4-6-0, but towards the end of April a Compound, 41188 (27B), contrived to get into this diagram and after several days of indifferent performance failed at Pickhill on the down journey on 27/4/54; it was replaced for the remainder of the day by a Starbeck (50D) J39, and on the next day by 45075 (25G). |
SLS/195406 |
23/07/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. |
SLS/196109 |
09/02/1964 |
Crewe Works (Works Yard) |
Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. |
SLS/196403 |
01/04/1964 |
Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Erecting Shop: New Construction, D1583-98 (in various stages), D205/27/46/70/86, D303/7/28/30/83/87, D5717, D6775/84, D6863/78, D8002/6/7/23/50, 44918, 45382/408/577/626, 46443, 48169/225/69/474/528/615/37/95/729/42, 70000/4/10, 82009 92121/22. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, D5719, D6783/9, 45426, 48154/436/742/50, 78041, 92137. Electric Shop: D204, D6843, E3007, 26000/9, 27003. Yard: 42055/81, 42410/583/699, 43957, 44405, 44676/873/917/87, 45217/372/445, 45569/658, 46436/41/524, 48073/258/332/424/613/749, 84021/3/4, 92002/62/156/73. Inside and Around Paint Shop: New Construction, D1563, D1567-82. Weigh Shed: 48753. Outside Paint Shop: D201/23/339, 26006, 45069/75, 48185/436/734, 92082/163. Inside Paint Shop: D259, D311, D1034, 49395, 92053 and L.M.S. 6229 Duchess of Hamilton, painted in L.M.S livery (for a Butlins Camp). |
SLS/196405 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Normanton) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |