Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 603 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14009 Week
» 67025 Month
» 186552 Year
» 3213405 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5082 |
m/e |
03/1935 |
British Railways |
45082 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4625 |
To Service |
During 03/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/07/1966 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/02/1948 |
St Rollox Works |
The first locomotive to bear the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tender was Class '5' No. 5081 (Tender 9069), which was painted black; the lettering on the tender was in white 8' unshaded Gill Sans letters, with sufficient space between the words for the insertion of a crest. This was followed by No. 5082 (Tender 9005) on 4/2, which had been painted in the same style; both locomotives had the number prefixed by an 'M.' No. 6143 , the first 'Scot' to be repaired here since Pre-war days, arrived at the Works on 10/12 and, following a complete service repair, was despatched on 25/12; its original maroon livery having been cleaned and retouched. H.R. No. 103 and C.R. 123 have now been moved to the Varnish Shop |
SLS/194803 |
29/02/1948 |
St Rollox Works |
The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again |
SLS/194804 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5082 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4625 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45082 |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45082 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|