Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 959 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5533 Week
» 33491 Month
» 68133 Year
» 1289698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5110 m/e 06/1935
BR 45110 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4653
To Service During 06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/08/1968
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7C Holyhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5C Stafford w/e 07/03/1964
9K Bolton w/e 24/07/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 17/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 01/07/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 17/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 5110
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4653
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holyhead (7C)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45110    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45110    

prev prev