Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2199 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20002 Week
» 73018 Month
» 192545 Year
» 3219398 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5114 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
British Railways |
45114 |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4657 |
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/01/1968 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5114 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4657 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45114 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45114 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|