Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 193 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5947 Week
» 33905 Month
» 68547 Year
» 1290112 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5162 m/e 08/1935
BR 45162 w/e 17/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1203
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal Sat 19/11/1966
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29A Perth South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/07/1953
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/09/1954
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 22/08/1964
64A St Margarets 5w/e 30/10/1965
   Withdrawn 19/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 5w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 5162
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1203
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45162    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
04/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45162    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev