Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 276 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2615 Week
» 8749 Month
» 236633 Year
» 1458198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5175 m/e 08/1935
BR 45175 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1216
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal Fri 26/07/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1935
29A Perth South 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/08/1954
64D Carstairs 4w/e 18/02/1956
   Withdrawn 26/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 3w/e 18/02/1956
WDN   26/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 177, 640, 40644, 902/07, 2270, 2919, 43996, 4882, 45023/29/84/85, 45100/21/25/54/58/59, 5175/76, 45179, 45358, 5497, 45576/81, 45693, 45730, 54453, 14634, 15132/93, 16323, 17259, 57332/52, 17355/63, 57453, 17455, 17555/72, 17600/05/07/30/35. Another '60' class locomotive-No. 54640-has been lined out and was ex Works on 28/5, the '4P' classification is still carried, but a new shed plate-66B-has been fitted. No. 14397 Ben Y Gloe (Withdrawn W/E 5/2/49) arrived 'dead' at St. Rollox shed in a very delapidated condition from Perth on 21/4, and was still there on 12/5, but has subsequently been sent to Kilmarnock Works for cutting up. It was noted that the boiler was fitted with Ramsbottom valves on the firebox. The Works' shunter, No. 56025, has been fitted with the whistle from the ex L.N.W.R. railcar No. R29988, recently withdrawn. This is some-what more distinctive in these parts. An interesting point about the lining of the tender of No. 42741 is that the R.H. side has the lining following the contour of the side plates and crossing the horizontal beading, whilst the L.H. side has rectangular lining, the upper line running below the beading. The former style appeared on a number of St. Rollox painted Midland-style tenders, but the latter, as used by other Works, has since been adhered to. St. Rollox tend to use larger numbers on standard locomotives than do the English Works. No. 44885 has been fitted here with a boiler (No. 13049) having the forward top feed position, but with the taper only on the rear ring of the barrel. The original top feed casing has been used, with a small extension welded on the top. Other Class '5's' of the older varieties have been fitted with similar new or modified boilers at Crewe. SLS/194907
31/01/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 1179, 42203, 2207, 42793, 42876, 42918, 4901, 44957/60, 4961/69, 44999, 45155/73/4/5/94, 45320/55, 45443/84, 45583, 14493, 15172, 55238, 56254, 16274, 16333/64/71, 17276, 57292, 57361, 57417, 17550/79, 17682. No. 45575 was turned out on 14/1 in the new green livery-the first locomotive to be painted here in colours since the war. The 'Great Western' effect was enhanced by the fact that it has a domeless boiler. The St. Rollox tradition of having numbering of a different size to other works is retained, the numbers being of the larger size, as on the black locomotives painted here. The front numberplate and shedplate were at one time painted red, but were blacked over before completion. Nos. 54507 an 55199 following No. 45575 from the Paint Shop, have both had the background of their numberplates painted red. Another of the few remaining 'Jubilee's' with domeless boilers-No. 45579-is also in the Works, The Works' shunter-No. 56025-has been the object of a commendable piece of enterprise. On completion of its overhaul it has been beautifully repainted with full lining-even the front of the cab being lined-with crests of the smaller type on the saddle tanks. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5175
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1216
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
18/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45175    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (64D)    
26/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 45175    

prev prev