Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3006 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16412 Week
» 69428 Month
» 188955 Year
» 3215808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5180 |
m/e |
09/1935 |
British Railways |
45180 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1221 |
To Service |
During 09/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/09/1965 |
Service Life |
30 yrs , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5180 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1221 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45180 |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
04/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45180 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|