Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 799 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5400 Week
» 16947 Month
» 416629 Year
» 493216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5212   11/1935
BR 45212 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1253
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal During 08/1968
Service Life 32 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24F Fleetwood 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A Carnforth w/e 03/10/1964
8C Speke Junction w/e 06/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 26/06/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 25/09/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 06/01/1968
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 5212
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1253
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45212    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45212    

prev prev