Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5214 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
British Railways |
45214 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1255 |
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/12/1966 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5214 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1255 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45214 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
14/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45214 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|