Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2134 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15540 Week
» 68556 Month
» 188083 Year
» 3214936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5216 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
British Railways |
45216 |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1257 |
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/02/1966 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5216 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1257 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45216 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45216 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|