Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3987 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17393 Week
» 70409 Month
» 189936 Year
» 3216789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5223 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
British Railways |
45223 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1959 |
Leicester GC MPD |
Leicester GC (15E) - All the LMR Class 5s have been transferred to Annesley, viz. 44932, 45116, 45223/34, 45450. |
SLS/196003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5223 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1264 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45223 |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45223 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|