Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 365 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 10098 Month
» 237982 Year
» 1459547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5231 m/e 08/1936
BR 45231 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1286
To Service During 08/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 32 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1936
10C Patricroft 01/01/1948
2E Northampton 4w/e 09/10/1954
3D Aston 4w/e 06/11/1954
5D Stoke w/e 05/08/1961
21D Aston w/e 19/08/1961
2A Rugby w/e 23/02/1963
6A Chester (MR) w/e 22/06/1963
8C Speke Junction w/e 01/04/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2E Northampton 4w/e 02/10/1954
EXLOAN 10C Patricroft 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 02/09/1961
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205
06/03/1963 Rugby MPD Following complaints from drivers, Britannias 70017/22/3/4 have been transferred to Aston in exchange for 45065, 45231, 45418/48. During the bad weather in the winter they were in store and in their place 45599 an 45704 were taken out of store for a short time. SLS/196304
01/04/1963 Swadlincote closure The closure of the Swadlincote loop to passenger trains applies only to the Woodville Junc.-Woodville section, which may be closed completely. As there are no run-round facilities at Woodville, excursions are unlikely to use other than the Swadlincote Junc.-Swadlincote section. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5231
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1286
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45231    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
19/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
01/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45231    

prev prev