Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 494 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2609 Week
» 25115 Month
» 328305 Year
» 1549870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5245 m/e 09/1936
British Railways 45245 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1300
To Service During 09/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1936
4A Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 09/09/1951
63D Fort William 4w/e 12/06/1954
63A Perth South 4w/e 27/11/1954
64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/06/1957
64D Carstairs 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 28/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 19/04/1947
LOAN 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 63D Fort William 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   w/e 12/10/1964
WDN   w/e 28/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601
12/06/1954 Scottish Miscellany On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. SLS/195408
30/08/1961 St. Rollox Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3005, D3206/78, D3913, D5314/6/7, D6116, 42059, 44877, 44976, 45011/23/49, 45245, 45360, 45679/91. Paint Shop: 44703. Outside Paint Shop: 42805, 45366, 45677. Works Yard: D5309, 44721, 45018, 57617, 57658. Works Shunter: D3342. SLS/196110
17/05/1963 Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5245
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1300
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45245    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Fort William (63D)    
27/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
08/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (64D)    
28/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45245    

prev prev