Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15448 Week
» 68464 Month
» 187991 Year
» 3214844 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5255 |
m/e |
10/1936 |
British Railways |
45255 |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1310 |
To Service |
During 10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1969 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5255 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45255 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45255 |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|