|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1959 | Rugby Works | 42677(5A), 45256(8A), 45615/77, 48711 (8E), 73157(14D), 80082(1E), 92032(16D), 90080(2F). | SLS/195903 |
26/11/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5256 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1311 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
12/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45256 | ||
03/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
13/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
23/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
12/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
27/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
11/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (10B) | ||
05/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45256 | ||
06/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |