10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5260 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1315 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45260 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
10/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45260 |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|