Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1102 Yesterday
» 6729 Week
» 29235 Month
» 332425 Year
» 1553990 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5269 m/e 11/1936
British Railways 45269 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1324
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Scrapping During 03/1969
Service Life 31 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1936
21A Saltley on 01/01/1948
21B Bournville 4w/e 21/02/1953
21A Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953
27F Brunswick w/e 14/05/1960
21A Saltley w/e 16/07/1960
16A Nottingham w/e 18/05/1963
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 28/03/1964
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/03/1968
9K Bolton w/e 11/05/1968
10D Lostock Hall w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 04/10/1958
EXLOAN 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 27F Brunswick 4w/e 28/05/1960
EXLOAN 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 09/03/1968
ALLOC 9K Bolton w/e 11/05/1968
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall on 01/07/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905
01/05/1959 Rugby Works On 1st May u/r-42253(14D), 45137(14E), 45269(21A), 49081(5C), 49216(3A). Awaiting works-44819(14D), 73127(26F). SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5269
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1324
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
09/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45269    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
14/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (27F)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45269    

prev prev