Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 122 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1359 Week
» 3941 Month
» 268574 Year
» 1490139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5270 m/e 11/1936
BR 45270 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1325
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/09/1967
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1936
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 18/06/1960
5B Crewe South w/e 17/09/1960
5A Crewe North w/e 31/12/1960
1A Willesden w/e 16/03/1963
1F Rugby w/e 26/10/1963
1H Northampton w/e 25/01/1964
6A Chester (MR) w/e 20/06/1964
5D Stoke w/e 19/09/1964
5B Crewe South w/e 12/08/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 16/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 1F Rugby 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 1H Northampton 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 5D Stoke 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 12/08/1967
WDN   w/e 16/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5270
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1325
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45270    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (1H)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
16/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45270    

prev prev