Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 72 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1309 Week
» 3891 Month
» 268524 Year
» 1490089 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5272 m/e 11/1936
BR 45272 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1327
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1936
22A Bristol Barrow Road 01/01/1948
20A Holbeck (MR) 5w/e 16/07/1949
19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 11/08/1951
21A Saltley 4w/e 04/12/1954
6D Shrewsbury w/e 18/04/1964
5A Crewe North w/e 20/06/1964
6B Mold Junction w/e 18/07/1964
2E Saltley w/e 07/11/1964
2B Oxley w/e 03/04/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 2B Oxley 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 09/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5272
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1327
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45272    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
09/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45272    

prev prev