Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2536 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15942 Week
» 68958 Month
» 188485 Year
» 3215338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5276 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
British Railways |
45276 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1331 |
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/01/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5276 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1331 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45276 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
23/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45276 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|