|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5286 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1341 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) | ||
12/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45286 | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
01/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (10B) | ||
26/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
13/03/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45286 | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |