Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5293   12/1937
BR 45293 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1348
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12B Carlisle Upperby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 21/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5293
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1348
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45293    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45293    

prev prev