Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1030 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8490 Week
» 6003 Month
» 233887 Year
» 1455452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5305 m/e 01/1937
BR 45305 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1360
To Service During 01/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1968
Service Life 31 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1937
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948
5A Crewe North 4w/e 02/12/1950
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 27/01/1951
6J Holyhead m/e 16/06/1956
5B Crewe South 4w/e 06/10/1956
5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957
9A Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
9A Longsight w/e 05/11/1960
12F Workington w/e 19/11/1960
1A Willesden w/e 31/03/1962
6A Chester (MR) w/e 02/11/1963
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/08/1965
8C Speke Junction w/e 09/12/1967
10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 26/04/1947
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 02/08/1947
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 11/10/1947
LOAN 2C Northampton w/e 28/08/1948
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 6J Holyhead w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 9A Longsight 5w/e 03/12/1960
LOAN 12F Workington 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 30/12/1967
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 10/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309
27/03/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5305
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1360
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45305    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12F)    
31/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
10/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45305    

prev prev