Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1463 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14869 Week
» 67885 Month
» 187412 Year
» 3214265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5306 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
British Railways |
45306 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1361 |
To Service |
During 01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/01/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1937 |
11A |
|
Carnforth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5D |
|
Stoke |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
24L |
|
Carnforth |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
24L |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
01/09/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5306 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1361 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45306 |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45306 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|