Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2001 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19804 Week
» 72820 Month
» 192347 Year
» 3219200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5313 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
British Railways |
45313 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1368 |
To Service |
During 02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/02/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5313 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1368 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45313 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45313 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|