|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). | SLS/196602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5318 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1373 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
04/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45318 | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (9M) | ||
10/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
06/07/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45318 | ||
03/1969 | Scrapped | Scrapped |