Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1085 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14491 Week
» 67507 Month
» 187034 Year
» 3213887 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5328 |
m/e |
03/1937 |
British Railways |
45328 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1383 |
To Service |
During 03/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/09/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5328 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1383 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45328 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45328 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|