Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14729 Week
» 67745 Month
» 187272 Year
» 3214125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5335 |
m/e |
03/1937 |
British Railways |
45335 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1390 |
To Service |
During 03/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/07/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5335 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1390 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45335 |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45335 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|