Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 97 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3714 Week
» 15419 Month
» 346908 Year
» 423495 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5337   04/1937
BR 45337 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1392
To Service During 04/1937
Withdrawal During 02/1965
Service Life 27 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26B Agecroft 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27C Southport w/e 24/08/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5337
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1392
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45337    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45337    

prev prev