Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5352 |
m/e |
05/1937 |
British Railways |
45352 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1407 |
To Service |
During 05/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/04/1967 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5352 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1407 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45352 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45352 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|