Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 323 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 323 Week
» 7507 Month
» 315488 Year
» 1199869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5366 m/e 06/1937
BR 45366 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1421
To Service During 06/1937
Withdrawal Fri 17/04/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29A Perth South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn 17/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   17/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5366
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1421
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45366    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45366    

prev prev