Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 491 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6245 Week
» 34203 Month
» 68845 Year
» 1290410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5367 m/e 06/1937
BR 45367 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1422
To Service During 06/1937
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 3w/e 14/01/1950
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 09/09/1951
63D Fort William 4w/e 12/06/1954
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/09/1954
63A Perth South 4w/e 02/10/1954
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 11/10/1947
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 31/12/1949
EXLOAN 24A Accrington w/e 11/03/1950
LOAN 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 63D Fort William 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 22/10/1960
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5367
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1422
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45367    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield (25B)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
12/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Fort William (63D)    
04/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
02/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 45367    

prev prev