|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/03/1966 | Crewe Works (Stored or waiting works) | Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. | SLS/196605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5374 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1429 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
07/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
16/12/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45374 | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
29/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
19/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (21B) | ||
21/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
16/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford (5C) | ||
24/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45374 | ||
05/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |