Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 712 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 5150 Month
» 313131 Year
» 1197512 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5378 m/e 07/1937
BR 45378 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1433
To Service During 07/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/03/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12B Carlisle Upperby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A Rugby 4w/e 21/04/1956
10C Patricroft m/e 16/06/1956
26C Bolton w/e 15/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 06/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 05/06/1948
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 21/04/1956
EXLOAN 10C Patricroft w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 26C Bolton 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 06/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5378
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1433
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45378    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45378    

prev prev