Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 749 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1789 Week
» 11959 Month
» 289755 Year
» 1174136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5379 m/e 07/1937
BR 45379 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1434
To Service During 07/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/07/1965 off Willesden (1A)
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2A Rugby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2C Northampton 3w/e 11/12/1948
5A Crewe North m/e 16/06/1956
1E Bletchley w/e 06/05/1961
1A Willesden w/e 07/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 31/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 03/01/1948
LOAN 2C Northampton w/e 20/11/1948
EXLOAN 2A Rugby w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 31/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1974
Current Status Boiler certificate expired
Information Boiler certificate expired at midnight on 9th September 2018.
Link https://www.watercressline.co.uk/article.php/30/45379-lms-black
Status Date 10/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5379
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1434
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45379    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45379    

prev prev