Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 352 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18155 Week
» 71171 Month
» 190698 Year
» 3217551 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5388 |
m/e |
07/1937 |
British Railways |
45388 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1443 |
To Service |
During 07/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/08/1968 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1969 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5388 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1443 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45388 |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45388 |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|