Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5428 m/e 10/1937
BR 45428 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1483
To Service During 10/1937
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Service Life 30 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12B Carlisle Upperby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 03/12/1955
55C Farnley Junction w/e 25/04/1959
55B Stourton 4w/e 08/10/1966
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 28/01/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/11/1947
EXLOAN 10C Patricroft w/e 07/02/1948
LOAN 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 55B Stourton 4w/e 08/10/1966
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 25/02/1967
WDN   30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5428
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1483
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45428    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stourton (55B)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45428    
26/07/1969 Sightings Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited (as 5428 'Eric Treacy') RO 9/1969 Link
26/07/1969 Sightings D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 RO 9/1969  

prev prev