Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1684 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15090 Week
» 68106 Month
» 187633 Year
» 3214486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5439 |
m/e |
11/1937 |
British Railways |
45439 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1494 |
To Service |
During 11/1937 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
21/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
21D |
Aston |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
ALLOC |
21C |
Bushbury |
4w/e |
29/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
2J |
Aston |
4w/e |
08/05/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5439 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1494 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45439 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
13/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (2J) |
|
|
11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45439 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|