Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5440 |
m/e |
11/1937 |
British Railways |
45440 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1495 |
To Service |
During 11/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/09/1967 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5440 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1495 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45440 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45440 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|