Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5341 Week
» 20455 Month
» 323645 Year
» 1545210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5452 m/e 09/1938
British Railways 45452 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/07/1959
64D Carstairs 4w/e 21/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962
<unknown> (Reinstated) m/e 02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/07/1959
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 4w/e 21/11/1959
WDN   on 29/12/1962
REINS 66E Carstairs 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   w/e 13/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
31/10/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40186, 590, 617/27, 41175, 1184, 2195, 2694, 2746, 42809, 2831, 4794, 44960/92, 45007/09/87, 45123/24/38, 45389, 45452/69, 45471/72/82/86/92, 46221, 14472, 15140, 15213, 16243/59, 56261, 16306/53/55, 17246, 17339/64, 57556, 17602/26/40/68. St. Rollox have now started using the B.R. crest, but as yet none of the ex-C.R. locomotives has received one. Two of the diesel railcars are laid up at St. Rollox, and the third at Hamilton. It is rumoured that one is to be broken up SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5452
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45452    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (64D)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 45452    
02/1963 Reinstated      

prev prev