Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 144 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1178 Week
» 23684 Month
» 326874 Year
» 1548439 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5453 m/e 09/1938
British Railways 45453 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1938
28A Motherwell on 01/01/1948
60A Inverness 4w/e 17/06/1950
63A Perth South 4w/e 27/08/1960
68B Dumfries 4w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Motherwell w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC 60A Inverness 5w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 St. Rollox Works Engines into shops: 1131, 2276, 3868, 4884, 7168, 16321, 16329, 17278, 17322, 17367, 17634, 40688, 40924, 42217, 42877, 44701, 44886, 44970, 44976, 44992, 44996, 44997, 45009, 45084, 45125, 45162, 45432, 45453, 45461, 45463. 45465, 45564, 45692, 54480, 54484, 54488, 54491, 55126, 56346, 57329, 57456, 57580, 57592, 57625. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5453
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45453    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 45453    

prev prev