Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5454 m/e 09/1938
British Railways 45454 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal During 08/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 28 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1938
12A Carlisle Kingmoor on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 16/06/1951
10B Preston 4w/e 10/08/1957
2E Northampton w/e 11/04/1961
1A Willesden w/e 28/11/1964
1H Northampton w/e 09/01/1965
2D Banbury w/e 02/10/1965
16B Colwick w/e 19/02/1966
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 25/06/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 02/03/1946
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC CAR Carlisle Canal w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 10B Preston 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC IA   4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 1H Northampton 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 09/07/1966
WDN   w/e 02/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5454
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
26/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45454    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (1H)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (2D)    
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
25/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45454    

prev prev