Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 104 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5325 Week
» 20439 Month
» 323629 Year
» 1545194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5455 m/e 09/1938
British Railways 45455 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal During 08/1967
Scrapping During 02/1968
Service Life 28 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1938
12A Carlisle Kingmoor on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 02/03/1946
WDN   w/e 02/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively.
No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date.
No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump
SLS/194810
27/08/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. SLS/194910
11/08/1956 West Cumberland Visit SLS members gathered by devious routes in the Citadel station at Carlisle, the writer travelling G. & S.W. from Glasgow 'spotting' ex G.E. 2-4-2T No. 67157 awaiting scrapping at Kilmarnock works with several compound 4-4-0's and K2 2-6-0's. While at Dumfries the last of the McIntosh 19' Class 0-4-4T's (No. 55124) was seen, the London Midland Region striving to cope with large holiday crowds. Matters were not improved by the 'Royal Scot' being halted for a quarter of an hour at platform 3 for its Pacific, 46224, to be replaced by 46252. Our connection, the Perth-London, departed 21½ minutes late at 1-16½ behind 46242 and on arrival at Penrith it was found that temporary alterations had been made in the service on the C.K. & P.-the 1-30 p.m. to Workington followed the through train from Manchester to Keswick. This comprised Class 2MT 2-6-0's Nos. 46456/7, coupled tender to tender, with eight corridors. Traversing Lakeland in brilliant sunshine, after early rain, we descended at tree-shaded Keswick and continued by the retimed 1-30 which was worked by 46491. At Workington (Main), reached at 3-49, a visit was paid to the shed where the centre of attraction was ex-Furness 0-6-0 No. 52499 (with L. & Y. boiler). Another of these locos., 52510, was seen on a freight. The plan to return immediately to Carlisle to do Silloth had now to be abandoned, in any case on Saturdays this branch is taken over from the diesels by J39's and instead we carried on along the coast to Whitehaven by the 4-28 (3.25 ex-Carlisle) which was another steam train-2-6-4T No. 42544 with four packed coaches. At Whitehaven (Bransty) cameras were focussed on un-rebuilt Patriot No. 45542 which came in with a train from the south. Earlier, Stanier 2-6-0 No. 42962 had been seen on one of these, before rejoining the train which now formed the 5-15 to Carlisle. However, some diehards waited for the 6-15 departure and at last ran a diesel set to earth. After traversing the erstwhile Maryport and Carlisle line, the Citadel station was reached 2 minutes late at 6-40 p.m. when a final spot of excitement was provided by our using the same platform as the empty stock of the Royal Train which, that morning, had arrived at Appleby with the Queen and Duke of Edinburgh. It departed northwards in charge of Class SMT 4-6-0's Nos. 44676 an 45455. SLS/195610
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Minor Repair Road) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
10/10/1964 Crewe Works (Traverser Area) Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. SLS/196411
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5455
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45455    
08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45455    

prev prev