Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 998 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 24538 Month
» 327728 Year
» 1549293 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5456 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45456 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 14/03/1959
67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 26/09/1959
67E Dumfries 5w/e 30/05/1964
   Withdrawn on 07/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   on 07/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401
31/05/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender.
Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed
SLS/194807
30/04/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. SLS/195006
18/02/1963 Glasgow St. Rollox (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop. 42271, 42800/3, 44923/57, 45423/56/60/78/99, D3730/8, D3916, D5337/69, D5121/3, D6105/23/4/31, Test House: D3280, D6103. Paint Shop-stored: D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Ex-Works: 45357/62, 45496. Awaiting Works: 42195, 44980, D6100 fire damage, D6107/14. Works shunters. D2772, D3542. D6123 was being prepared for Paxman Works, Colchester. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5456
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45456    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
07/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45456    

prev prev